Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:25-cv-00922
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, 25-02746
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Morse TEC LLC
Defendant
Genuine Parts Company
Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
Defendant
Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Defendant
Hennessy Industries, LLC
Defendant
Holley Performance Products, Inc.
Defendant
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By
Laura M. Gillen
Blue Williams, Llp (metairie)
contact info
Defendant
Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc.
Defendant
International Paper Company
Defendant
Isuzu Motors America, LLC
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
6575 Snowdrift Road Suite 101
Allentown, PA 18106
Defendant
Mack Trucks, Inc.
Defendant
Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant
General Electric Company
Defendant
Navistar, Inc.
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
Defendant
Paramount Global
Defendant
Perfection Hy-Test Co.
Defendant
Pneumo Abex LLC
Defendant
Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Defendant
Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Defendant
The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant
Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
Defendant
Valves & Controls, US, Inc.
Defendant
Velan Valve Corporation
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Defendant
Cummins, Inc.
Defendant
Amdura LLC
Defendant
American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Defendant
BW/IP, Inc.
Defendant
BWDAC, Inc
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
Defendant
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Defendant
Briggs and Stratton Corporation
Defendant
Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction
Defendant
Carrier Corporation
Defendant
Caterpillar Glogal Mining, LLC
Defendant
Caterpillar Inc.
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant
Clyde Union, Inc.
Defendant
DCO, LLC
Defendant
Daimler Truck North America LLC
Defendant
Eagle, Inc.
Defendant
Eaton Corporation
Defendant
Enerpac Tool Group Corp.
Defendant
FMC Corporation
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Defendant
Federal-Mogul Motorparts LLC
Defendant
Flowserve US Inc.
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Defendant
Foster Wheeler LLC
Defendant
G. Denver and Co., LLC
Plaintiff
Richard Hotard


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
14 14 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 05/14 2:46 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. (Strain, Stacey)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 05/14 1:51 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Morse TEC LLC (Hays, Bradley) Modified on 5/14/2025 (lag)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 05/14 12:22 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Daimler Truck North America LLC (Ziffer, Lee)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Wed 05/14 12:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal - Complaint and First Amended Complaint by Daimler Truck North America LLC.Attorney Lee Blanton Ziffer added to party Daimler Truck North America LLC(pty:dft).(Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 5/14/2025 (lag)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 05/14 9:52 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Patin, Darren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/13 4:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity Management & Research, LLC, Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc, Corporate Parent GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Corporate Parent GE Capital Funding, LLC, Corporate Parent GE Capital International Funding Company Unlimited Company, Corporate Parent GE Capital UK Funding Unlimited Company, Corporate Parent GE SCF Societe En Commandite Par Actions, Corporate Parent Security Capital Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent GE Capital Equity, Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc, Corporate Parent General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Corporate Parent GE Capital for General Electric Company (Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 05/13 4:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by General Electric Company.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/13 4:07 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC Scotland for Foster Wheeler LLC (Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 05/13 4:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Foster Wheeler LLC.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/13 11:38 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Paramount Global (Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 05/13 11:24 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Paramount Global.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Paramount Global(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk. (lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/09 12:03 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2025-02746 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10993678) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.Attorney Laura M. Gillen added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Gillen, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet