Latimore v. Williams et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Eva J Dossier |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00926 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2025 |
Case in other court: | 21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, 25-0000895 E |
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 1:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clifford Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shavonne Latimore
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Brandon S. Long no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 5/12/2025.(meb) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal.(meb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/09 1:43 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (cmi) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2025-0000895 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10993880) filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Clifford Williams.Attorney Stanton E. Shuler, Jr added to party Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stanton E. Shuler, Jr added to party Clifford Williams(pty:dft).(Shuler, Stanton) Modified text on 5/9/2025 (meb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |