JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Detherage
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Referred: | Ronald L Hanna |
Case #: | 1:25-mc-01002 |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JUUL Labs, Inc. re1 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal JLI's Motion to Compel Appearance and Testimony of Nonparty Alexis Detherage at Deposition ,2 +++ SEALED MOTION (Danninger, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Order on Sealed Motion +
Thu 05/15 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The document and its attachments located in docket entry2 are to remain SEALED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ronald L Hanna on 05/15/2025. (NJR) |
||
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 05/12 11:20 AM
Filing fee: $ 52.00, receipt number PIA 100006683 (DW) |
||
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() +++ SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff JUUL Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2025(Danninger, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal JLI's Motion to Compel Appearance and Testimony of Nonparty Alexis Detherage at Deposition by Plaintiff JUUL Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2025(Danninger, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |