Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-05161
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:12 PM CDT
Defendant
Academy of Osseointegration
Plaintiff
Federal Insurance Company
Represented By
Christopher A Wadley
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info
Alla Cherkassky Galati
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 2:40 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT [Complaint for Declaratory Judgment] filed by Federal Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23465281.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (2020 Policy),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (2024 Policy),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (May 2016 Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Oct. 15, 2020 Termination Letter),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (Nov. 3, 2020 Demand Letter),
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 (Mar. 11, 2021 Second Demand Ltr. & Lit. Hold Ltr.),
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 (Underlying Lawsuit Complaint))(Galati, Alla) (Entered: 05/09/2025
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Galati, Alla)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company by Alla Cherkassky Galati (Galati, Alla)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company by Christopher A Wadley (Wadley, Christopher)
Related: [-]