Dyer et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00929 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2025 |
Case in other court: | 22nd JDC - Parish of St. Tammany, 25-11738 |
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:09 PM CDT |
Selection Required
Charter Communications, Inc.
|
|
Selection Required
Curtis Dyer
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amendment/Supplement to Document by Charter Communications, Inc. re3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure (Mouhot, Alex) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Charter Communications, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.(Mouhot, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (go) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Charter Communications, Inc. (Mouhot, Alex) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/09 3:33 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cmi) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC - Parish of St. Tammany, case number 2025-11738 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Charter Communications, Inc..Attorney Alex Mouhot added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Mouhot, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee - 405 dollars for case filed AFTER 12/01/2023
Fri 05/09 3:10 PM
Filing fee paid from Charter Communications, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BLAEDC-10994190) (Mouhot, Alex) |