Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-11360
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Wayne County Circuit Court, 25-003333-NO
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Nicole M. Wright
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawanda Thomas


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 6 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 25-003333-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10232384 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint.,
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Service of Process Transmittal, Dated April 9, 2025.,
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Stipulated Order to Modify the Caption of Plaintiffs Complaint to Identify the Correct Walmart Legal Entity, Dated May 2, 2025.,
Att: 5 Exhibit D, Stipulated Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, Dated May 2, 2025.,
Att: 6 Exhibit E, Correspondence to Plaintiffs Attorney Capping Damages, Dated April 24, 2025, and Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages.,
Att: 7 Exhibit F, Email from Plaintiffs Attorney Declining to Cap Damages, Dated April 30, 2025.
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 05/09 4:19 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]