Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:25-cv-02378
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
1550 PEACHTREE STREET NW
ATLANTA, GA 30309
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
475 ANTON BLVD.
COSTA MESA, CA 92626
Defendant
LENTEGRITY, LLC
251 LITTLE FALLS DRIVE
WILMINGTON, DE 19808
Defendant
TRANS UNION, LLC
555 WEST ADAMS STREET
CHICAGO, IL 60661
Plaintiff
AMOS STOLTZFUS
336 MAIN STREET
PARKESBURG, PA 19365


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/20 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. MILZ on behalf of AMOS STOLTZFUS (MILZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/20 10:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bryce Keizer re: served Complaint and Summons upon Mary Garcia for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Corporate Service on 05/16/2025 (LOPEZ-JACOBS, JODY)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 05/16 12:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven A. Stosur re: served Complaint and Summons upon Trinity Daniel for Trans Union, LLC by Corporate Service on May 15, 2025 (LOPEZ-JACOBS, JODY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 12:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMOS STOLTZFUS re: Herbert Giles served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by Corporate Service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (LOPEZ-JACOBS, JODY)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMOS STOLTZFUS re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon LENTEGRITY, LLC by Corporate Service. LENTEGRITY, LLC served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (LOPEZ-JACOBS, JODY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 11:50 AM
Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., LENTEGRITY, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC. (amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 05/09 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., LENTEGRITY, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18281694.), filed by AMOS STOLTZFUS.(LOPEZ-JACOBS, JODY)
Related: [-]