California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-04045
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 Foreclosure
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff
Richard Reed
8001 Idlewood St
Oakland, CA 94605


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 4:44 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 05/09/2025.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Self Help Flyer,
Att: 2 Pro Se Handbook
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/09 2:12 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (pjf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 24cv089754. ( Filing fee $405 Rcpt. No: 411018483 ). Filed by Richard Reed. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2025.(pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt