Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:25-cv-00930
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 858761
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:13 PM CDT
Defendant
Francisco Garcia
Defendant
Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Jean E. Lavidalie, Jr.
Perrier & Lacoste, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rene's Contruction LLC
Plaintiff
Noah Abuhammoud
Plaintiff
Taim Abuhammoud
Plaintiff
Sana Aziz


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Party Thu 05/15 3:10 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by Sana Aziz. Related [+]
Related: [-] my, Andrea
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Wed 05/14 10:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,,, with Jury Demand by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Lavidalie, Jean)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 05/14 10:28 AM
Notice of Compliance with USC 1447 by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company re3 Order.(Lavidalie, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1 State Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2 State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Service
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 9:12 AM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal.(mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/09 3:31 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 858761 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10994219) filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney Jean E. Lavidalie, Jr added to party Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Lavidalie, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Supplemental & Amending Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-Demand to Progressive,
Att: 5 Exhibit D1-Medicals,
Att: 6 Exhibit D2-Medicals,
Att: 7 Exhibit E-Motion to Dismiss Minors,
Att: 8 Exhibit F-Rene's Construction in globo,
Att: 9 Exhibit G-No Service on Rene's,
Att: 10 Exhibit H-Progressive Specialty in globo,
Att: 11 Exhibit I-Progressive service letter