New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:25-cv-03910
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332au Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 5:11 PM EDT
Defendant
AD Lucky Trans Ltd.
Represented By
Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Law Offices Of Lorne M. Reiter, LLC
contact info
Defendant
BODKIN, A Division of Bennington Financial Corp.
Represented By
Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Law Offices Of Lorne M. Reiter, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bennington Financial Corp.
Represented By
Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Law Offices Of Lorne M. Reiter, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelvin De Aza


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/14 11:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Lorne Mitchell Reiter to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/13 7:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by BODKIN, A Division of Bennington Financial Corp., Bennington Financial Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iter, Lorne
Att: 1 Affidavit Cert. of Service
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 7:40 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AD Lucky Trans Ltd., BODKIN, A Division of Bennington Financial Corp., Bennington Financial Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iter, Lorne
Att: 1 Affidavit Cert. of Service
Monday, May 12, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/12 10:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 05/12 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/12 10:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 05/12 11:11 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lorne Mitchell Reiter re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/09 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. Related [+]
Related: [-] iter, Lorne
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807507/2025E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31060545).Document filed by AD Lucky Trans Ltd., Bennington Financial Corp., BODKIN, A Division of Bennington Financial Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iter, Lorne
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer,
Att: 3 Affidavit Cert. of Service