Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Cj Williams
Referred: Mark A Roberts
Case #: 6:25-cv-02022
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Iowa District Court for Black Hawk County, LACV153578
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Southwire Company, LLC
Represented By
Peter Joseph Ickes
Grefe & Sidney PLC
contact info
Andrew D Hall
Grefe & Sidney
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Blake
Represented By
James H Cook
Jsc Legal PLC
contact info
Erich Dennis Priebe
Jsc Legal PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Mon 05/12 9:00 AM
DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases (jag)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc STATE Court Petition Mon 05/12 8:59 AM
STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Adam Blake (jag)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/12 8:56 AM
Chief Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines Mon 05/12 9:02 AM
Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/2/2025. Plaintiff FRCP 7.1(a)(2) Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2025. Defendant FRCP 7.1(a)(2) Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2025. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/09 2:35 PM
ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Southwire Company, LLC.(Ickes, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Removal by Southwire Company, LLC from Iowa District Court for Black Hawk County, case number LACV153578. Defendant was served with state court petition/documents on 04/10/2025 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4403533), filed by Southwire Company, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2025 (Ickes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet