Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:25-cv-00816
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 3:10 PM PDT
Defendant
HADDINGTON DYNAMICS II, LLC
Defendant
HADDINGTON DYNAMICS, INC
Defendant
OCADO GROUP, PLC
Plaintiff
ARCHYTAS AUTOMATION, INC
McNutt Law Firm, P.C. 11441 Allerton Park Drive, Suite 100
Las Vegas, NV 89135
Represented By
Daniel R McNutt
Mcnutt Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
7 7 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 05/16 10:42 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Steven Callahan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel McNutt (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-8054135) by Plaintiff Archytas Automation, Inc.. (McNutt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/15 10:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Archytas Automation, Inc.. All Defendants. (McNutt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 05/13 3:39 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/3/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/3/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/13/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing Order Tue 05/13 8:23 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/12 12:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Haddington Dynamics II, LLC, Haddington Dynamics, Inc,, Ocado Group, PLC re1 Complaint. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 05/09 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ARCHYTAS AUTOMATION, INC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McNutt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/09 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against HADDINGTON DYNAMICS II, LLC, HADDINGTON DYNAMICS, INC, OCADO GROUP, PLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-8046580) by ARCHYTAS AUTOMATION, INC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/19/2025. Proof of service due by 8/7/2025. (McNutt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Haddington Dynamics II,
Att: 3 Summons Ocado Group,
Att: 4 Summons Haddington Dynamics Inc
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 05/12 12:31 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MAM)
Related: [-]