Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:25-cv-04061
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:USDC-District of New Jersey (Trenton), 3:25-cv-02826-GC-JTQ
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Howard Teitelbaum
Represented By
Harris L. Marks
Belluck Law, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/09 3:27 PM
Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the District of New Jersey (Trenton)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 11:25 AM
Order of MDL Panel (CTO-517 transferring case to the Northern District of California. (jjc)
Related: [-]
MEMBER CASE OPENED RE MDL NO. 2741: United States District Court for the District of New Jersey ((Trenton), 3:25-cv-02826-GC-JTQ, Teitelbaum v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-04061-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2025) (Entered: 05/09/2025)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 05/09 3:41 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED RE MDL NO. 2741: United States District Court for the District of New Jersey ((Trenton), 3:25-cv-02826-GC-JTQ, Teitelbaum v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-04061-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2025)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn added. Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against MONSANTO COMPANY (Filing and Admin. Fee: $405.00, receipt number ANJDC-16182227) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HOWARD TEITELBAUM.(MARKS, HARRIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
Related: [-]