Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:23-cv-00030
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Delaware Plastic Surgery, P.A.
Defendant
Dr. Fady J. Gerges
Defendant
Green Clinics LLC
Defendant
Green Clinics Laboratory, LLC
Defendant
Incendium LLC
Defendant
Dr. David E. Schmidt, Jr.
Defendant
Dr. Patrick Swier
Plaintiff
Dr. Thomas J. Burke
Represented By
Katherine Butler
Kate Butler Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
The State of Delaware
Represented By
Katherine Butler
Kate Butler Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Katherine Butler
Kate Butler Law LLC
contact info
Jacob Laksin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Claudia L. Pare
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Document Fri 05/09 3:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/9/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 [SEALED] Ex Parte NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention and Request to Unseal Documents - filed by United States of America.(mdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 [SEALED] ORDER GRANTING13 United States' UNOPPOSED ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/10/2025.(dlw)
Related: [-]
13 13 [SEALED] United States' UNOPPOSED ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal - filed by United States of America. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
12 12 [SEALED] ORDER GRANTING11 United States' UNOPPOSED ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/10/2024.(dlw)
Related: [-]
11 11 [SEALED] United States' UNOPPOSED ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal - filed by United States of America. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
10 10 [SEALED] ORDER GRANTING9 Unopposed ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2024.(dlw)
Related: [-]
9 9 [SEALED] United States' Unopposed ex parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal - filed by United States of America. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
8 8 [SEALED] ORDER GRANTING7 UNOPPOSED Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/11/2023.(dlw)
Related: [-]
7 7 [SEALED] UNOPPOSED Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal - filed by United States of America. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
6 6 [SEALED] ORDER GRANTING5 UNOPPOSED Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/8/2023. (dlw)
Related: [-]
5 5 [SEALED] UNOPPOSED Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Consider Intervention and to Retain the Statutory Seal - filed by United States of America. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
4 4 [SEALED] ORDER granting D.I.1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 01/13/2023.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (smg)
Related: [-]
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (smg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
3 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
Related: [-]
2 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Defendant 1, Defendant 2, Defendant 3, Defendant 4, Defendant 5, Defendant 6, Defendant 7 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 495.) - filed by Plaintiff 2, Plaintiff 1, Plaintiff 3.(smg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appearance,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Seal - filed by Plaintiff 1, Plaintiff 2, Plaintiff 3.(smg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Certificate of Service
No Summons Issued. (smg)
Related: [-]
Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge GBW. (smg)
Related: [-]