Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00571
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Cyera US Inc.
Defendant
Matthew Guanciale
Plaintiff
Varonis Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Hannah Paxton
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
John Anderson Sensing
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Timothy Ryan Dudderar
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/09 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Varonis Systems, Inc..Cyera US Inc. served on 5/9/2025, answer due 5/30/2025. (Sensing, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 05/09 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Cyera US Inc. on 5/9/2025; Matthew Guanciale on 5/9/2025.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
utility Remark Fri 05/09 9:28 AM
Remark: Exit Electronic copies to Duty Judge (GBW). (mpb)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Fri 05/09 10:00 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document of D.I.9 has been replaced to reflect the addition of the Court's seal. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/09 9:09 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Varonis Systems, Inc. (mpb)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Discovery Hearing Fri 05/09 9:07 AM
MOTION for Expedited Discovery and for Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Varonis Systems, Inc.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibits 1-4
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 05/09 9:03 AM
DECLARATION of Dana Shahar re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Varonis Systems, Inc.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 05/09 9:02 AM
DECLARATION of Gregory Pomeroy re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Varonis Systems, Inc. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 05/09 9:01 AM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Varonis Systems, Inc. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 05/09 9:00 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Varonis Systems, Inc.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 05/09 8:56 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/09 8:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Cyera US Inc., Matthew Guanciale (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4682461) - filed by Varonis Systems, Inc..(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet