Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00573
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Atlantic Oceanic LLC
Represented By
William J. Burton
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HF Hunter Shipping PTE. LTD
Represented By
Trevor T. Nielsen
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Sarah Taylor Runnells Martin
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Fri 05/09 6:57 PM
Letter to United States District Judge from William J. Burton, Esq. regarding Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Burton, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Fri 05/09 3:01 PM
Letter to The Clerk of the Court from Sarah R. Martin, Esq. regarding Requesting Expedited Consideration of the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Martin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Compendium of Unreported Decisions Fri 05/09 2:58 PM
Compendium of Unreported Decisions re6 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by HF Hunter Shipping PTE. LTD. (Martin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 05/09 2:56 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by HF Hunter Shipping PTE. LTD.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2025. (Martin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 05/09 2:52 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - filed by HF Hunter Shipping PTE. LTD.(Martin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/09 2:49 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by HF Hunter Shipping PTE. LTD. (Martin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Fri 05/09 9:49 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/09 9:45 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Atlantic Oceanic LLC. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 05/09 9:44 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2025-0502 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4682581)- filed by Atlantic Oceanic LLC.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet