Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:25-cv-02360
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, 250400981
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 4:14 AM EDT
Defendant
EXPEDITED SERVICES ROADTEX, INC.
23 OLD BETHLEHEM ROAD
PERKASIE, PA 18944
Represented By
JOSHUA DANIEL LEAVER
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith, PC
contact info
Defendant
KARINA GAFIATULLIN
36 WOODSIDE LANE
BRIDGEWATER, NJ 08807
Represented By
JOSHUA DANIEL LEAVER
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith, PC
contact info
Defendant
RICH ARL TRANSPORT, LLC
74 CASTLEWOOD TRAIL
SPARTA, NJ 07871
Defendant
ANATOLIY TURCHYN
13109 BUSTLETON AVENUE NO. B10
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19116
Represented By
JOSHUA DANIEL LEAVER
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHAZ CARTER
463 E. 173RD STREET 208A
BRONX, NY 10457
Represented By
ROBERT W. MUNLEY, III
Munley Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMARA CARTER
1094 OREGON ROAD APARTMENT 2
CORTLANDT MANOR, NY 10567
Represented By
ROBERT W. MUNLEY, III
Munley Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 2:29 PM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 5/9/25. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/9/25. 5/9/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Fri 05/09 11:54 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
***FILED IN ERROR***Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt) Modified on 5/9/2025 (sbt).
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 NOTICE by EXPEDITED SERVICES ROADTEX, INC., KARINA GAFIATULLIN, ANATOLIY TURCHYN (LEAVER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
2 2 Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by EXPEDITED SERVICES ROADTEX, INC., KARINA GAFIATULLIN, ANATOLIY TURCHYN . (LEAVER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KARINA GAFIATULLIN, EXPEDITED SERVICES ROADTEX, INC., ANATOLIY TURCHYN (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18278563), filed by KARINA GAFIATULLIN, EXPEDITED SERVICES ROADTEX, INC., ANATOLIY TURCHYN.(LEAVER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint