Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-01475
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:13 AM MDT
Petitioner
ODIN New Horizon Real Estate Fund LP
Represented By
Alexander Jacob Gershen
Scale LLP
contact info
Respondent
Allison Stanton
16622 East Asbury Avenue
Aurora, CO 80013


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Summons Request Fri 05/09 5:39 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Allison Stanton by Petitioner ODIN New Horizon Real Estate Fund LP. (Gershen, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition/Application Fri 05/09 5:29 PM
PETITION For Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CRS 38-35-204 (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10329631)Attorney Alexander Jacob Gershen added to party ODIN New Horizon Real Estate Fund LP(pty:pet), filed by ODIN New Horizon Real Estate Fund LP.(Gershen, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of R. Carbone,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Option,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Covenant,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C - Deed of Trust,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D - Memorandum,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E - Closing Instructions,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. F - Subordination Agreement,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. G - Assignment,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. H - Certificate of Purchase,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. I - Assignment of Certificate of Purchase,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. J - Confirmation Deed,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. K - UCC Financing Statement,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. L - Dec. 19, 2024 Document,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. M - Dec. 26, 2024 Grant Deed,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. N - Dec. 27, 2024 Document,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. O - Dec. 31, 2024 Grant Deed,
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex. P - Jan. 14, 2025 Document