New York Northern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00145
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 3:38 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Christopher T. Dupont (1)
Terminated: 04/10/2025


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 4:58 AM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION of SUPERVISED RELEASE accepted as to Christopher T. Dupont from Western District of New York to the Northern District of New York signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/10/2025. Transfer Court case number is 1:19-cr-163-004. This Court has already obtained copies of the indictment, judgment and docket sheet via PACER, unless the documents were sealed. NDNY no longer accepts transfer of criminal debt with a transfer of probation/supervised release jurisdiction, nor does the NDNY transfer out criminal debt with the transfer of probation/supervised release jurisdiction from NDNY to another district pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3605.(bas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 REDACTED indictment from WDNY,
Att: 2 Plea Agreement from WDNY,
Att: 3 Judgment from WDNY,
Att: 4 Docket Sheet from WDNY