Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00058
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:32 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anna Marie Bell-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Virginio Ernesto Quezada (1)
Terminated: 04/24/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Amarillo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Felipe Zavala-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 4:25 AM CDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Virginio Ernesto Quezada (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to Virginio Ernesto Quezada (mcrd)
Related: [-]