California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:25-cv-04028
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Frank Bisignano
Plaintiff
Henry Koltys
1385 East Mountain Drive
Montecito, CA 93108


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 05/19 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Koltys(Koltys, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons ATTY GEN - SUMMONS-PROOF-SERVICE,
Att: 2 Summons SSA - SUMMONS/PROOF-SERVICE,
Att: 3 Summons US ATTY ND CA - SUMMONS/PROOF-SERVICES ATTY NDCA -
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 05/19 1:01 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT (ec, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/19 12:19 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 05/19 10:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/16 12:07 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Henry Koltys.. (Koltys, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 05/09/2025.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Self Help Flyer,
Att: 2 Pro Se Handbook
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 05/09 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Frank Bisignano, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/09 10:37 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/09 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Frank Bisignano (Filing fee $ 405-311172836). Filed by Henry Koltys. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2025.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 receipt