Original Case: 1:24-cv-02154

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01182
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:19 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT
Represented By
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Evan P. Brennan
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Amy Christine Colony
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
Represented By
Michael Villecco
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 2:19 AM MDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
[11180049] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/08/2025. Notice of appearance due on 05/22/2025 for Philip E. Spesshardt, and Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2025 for Michael Villecco. 25-1182
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas
2 pgs [11180089] Jurisdictional review complete. Notice of appearance and appellant's brief due on 06/17/2025 for Michael Villecco. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/29/2025 25-1182
Related: [-]