Original Case: 1:25-cv-00072

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01183
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:19 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
DARCY RENEE KENNEDY, in her official capacity as Deputy Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AARON BOLGATZ, in his official capacity as Hearing Officer, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DREW N. HOUSER, in his official capacity as PEB Deputy, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN ANDREW STENINGER, in his official capacity as Director of the Industrial Claim Appeals Office, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
Represented By
Michael Villecco
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 2:19 AM MDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
[11180062] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/08/2025 Notice of appearance due on 05/22/2025 for Aaron Bolgatz, Drew N. Houser, Darcy Renee Kennedy and John Andrew Steninger. Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2025 for Michael Villecco. 25-1183
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas
2 pgs [11180168] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and notice of appearance due on 06/17/2025 for Michael Villecco. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/29/2025 25-1183
Related: [-]
30+ pgs [11180174] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. 25-1183
Related: [-]