Original Case: 1:24-cv-02702

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01184
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:19 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
CHER R. HAAVIND, in her official capacity as Deputy Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DARIN A. MULLEN, in his official capacity as WICS Branch Manager, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY D. NEWCOMB, in his official capacity as WICS Branch Manager, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LYNN PAULSON, in her official capacity as Benefits Services Branch Manager, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Represented By
Krista Marie Maher
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Thomas Julian Archer
State of Colorado
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
Represented By
Michael Villecco
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 2:19 AM MDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
[11180092] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/08/2025. Notice of appearance due on 05/22/2025 for Cher R. Haavind, Darin A. Mullen, Jeffrey D. Newcomb and Lynn Paulson, and Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2025 for Michael Villecco. 25-1184
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas
2 pgs [11180194] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 06/17/2025 for Michael Villecco. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/29/2025. 25-1184
Related: [-]
30+ pgs [11180200] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. 25-1184
Related: [-]