Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-01975
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 12:23 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hermelinda Gonzalez-Rodriguez (1)
Terminated: 04/21/2025
Represented By
Cheryl Inzunza Blum
contact info
Richard B Bacal
Law Office Of Richard B Bacal
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 1:13 AM MST
Thursday, April 10, 2025
Arrest of Hermelinda Gonzalez-Rodriguez on 4/10/2025. (SGG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Hermelinda Gonzalez-Rodriguez. (SGG)
Related: [-]