Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00662
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melissa Andrea Lopez
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nicolas Soria-Rivera (1)
Terminated: 04/30/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Rolando Charles, Jr
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 3:09 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
NOTICE OF RESETTING as to Nicolas Soria-Rivera.. Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2025 at 09:35 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga, filed. (dlg5)
Related: [-]
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Nicolas Soria-Rivera (1), filed (Zapata). Initial Appearance set for 4/11/2025 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (dlg5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Nicolas Soria-Rivera, filed. (dlg5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 11, 2025 at 02:42 PM as to Nicolas Soria-Rivera. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dlg5)
Related: [-]