Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-mj-00745
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lee Alfred Fry
Office Of U.S. Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Miguel Angel Martinez-Licona (1)
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Judith Odette Pena
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 3:10 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Miguel Angel Martinez-Licona (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (ced7)
Related: [-]