District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00025
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 3:24 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shehzad Akhtar
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SHAREEM HALL (1)
Terminated: 03/25/2025
Represented By
Eugene Jeen-Young Kim Ohm
Federal Public Defender For The District Of Columbia
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 4:12 AM EDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to SHAREEM HALL (1). (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to SHAREEM HALL.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to SHAREEM HALL (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 2/10/2025. (znmw)
Related: [-]