Randolph Smith v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02950 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions, LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Company, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus, Inc.
180 Etowah Trace
Fayetteville, GA 30214 |
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/09 4:36 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/7/2025), Randolph Smith v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02950-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District of Virginia (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12373308.), filed by Randolph Smith. Service due by 7/7/2025 (jbin) |