301 Properties LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jay C Zainey |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00933 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:01 AM CDT |
Selection Required
301 Properties LLC
|
|
Selection Required
Sextant Stays, Inc. d/b/a Roami
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sextant Stays, Inc. (Luminais, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting6 MOTION to Expedite. ORDERED:5 MOTION to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand shall be submitted on 5/21/2025 on the briefs. FURTHER ORDERED: Defendant, Sextant Stays, Inc., shall file any opposition to said Motion on or before 5/20/2025. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(mmm) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 05/14 11:01 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 MOTION to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand. Document has been accepted as is. Future filings identifying incorrect plaintiff will not be accepted. (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 301 Properties LLC (Cerise, Jason) |
|
6 | 6
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by 301 Properties LLC.(Cerise, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand by 301 Properties LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/28/2025.(Cerise, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 05/12 2:52 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Notice of Removal. Documents incorrectly submitted as legal sized documents. Local Rule 10.1: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (mmm) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 05/12 8:35 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) |
|
Saturday, May 10, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Amendment/Supplement to Document by Sextant Stays, Inc. d/b/a Roami re1 Notice of Removal, List of Parites and Pleadings(Luminais, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, Louisiana, case number 2025-04281 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10994814) filed by Sextant Stays, Inc. d/b/a Roami.Attorney Ryan O'Neil Luminais added to party Sextant Stays, Inc. d/b/a Roami(pty:selreq).(Luminais, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |