Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00283
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:16 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info
Maria Elena Llanos-Salinas
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Felix Padron-Melendez (1)
Terminated: 04/29/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Angel Omar Olivo-Garcia
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 2:25 AM CDT
Saturday, April 12, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Felix Padron-Melendez (1), filed. (Cameron) (mp1) (edg1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Felix Padron-Melendez arrested on 4/10/2025, filed. (mp1) (edg1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/14/2025) Unredacted attachment