Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Referred: Eleanor G Tennyson
Case #: 1:25-cv-00585
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/16 3:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson to conduct all proceedings and hear and determine all motions. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/15/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/15 10:27 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/15/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 10:26 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/12 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Carver on behalf of Leland Dudek(Carver, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 05/12 10:42 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Non-Prisoner Mon 05/12 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Leland Dudek - filed by Laqueisha Quanaisha A. Wintres.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/12 10:35 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Laqueisha Quanaisha Ashley Wintres. (jfm)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Transmittal - SSA Complaint Mon 05/12 10:52 AM
Notice of filing (electronically and non-electronically) to Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel, United States Attorney for the District of Delaware, and Plaintiff. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint per Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 3 and 4. An answer or a motion under Civil Rule 12 must be made with 60 days after notice. Please use code Answer to Complaint - Social Security. ***Copy of NEF mailed to the Pro Se Plaintiff as notification that service was made electronically.*** (jfm)
Related: [-]