HECNY SHIPPING LTD. v. HYC LOGISTICS, INC.
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Norris |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02499 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2025 |
Case in other court: | District of Columbia, 1:24-cv-02651 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 11:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
HYC Logistics, Inc.
2600 Thousand Oaks Blvd #1350
Memphis, TN 38118 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HECNY SHIPPING LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 08/01/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris via Microsoft Teams video conference. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . (zsf) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:24-cv-02651. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report Regarding Transfer, Dkt.21 , Plaintiff's request that the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee for further proceedings, and for the reasons stated on the record at the April 23, 2025 hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Dkt.11 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is, accordingly, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; the Court will not dismiss the action; but the Court will transfer the case to a district in which all parties agree the court will have personal jurisdiction over Defendant. Following the transfer, the Clerk is directed to close the docket before this Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2025. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 5/11/2025. (zglw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2025 re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HYC LOGISTICS, INC. Motion is denied in part and granted in part (Minute Order to follow). Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2025. (Court Reporter Tim Miller) (zglw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion to Continue Hearing, Dkt.16 , Plaintiff's Opposition, Dkt.18 , and Defendant's Reply, Dkt.19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The hearing scheduled for April 10, 2025 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to April 23, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2025. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
NOTICE OF ERROR re18 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to elliott.williams@lmplaw.net, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. DO NOT REFILE. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page. (zjm, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Sunday, April 06, 2025 | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of S. Joshua Kahane's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt.17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. S. Joshua Kahane may appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/6/2025. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Status Report, Dkt.14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for a hearing on the motion to dismiss, Dkt.11 , on April 10, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/27/2025. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding14 Status Report. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect format (Letter)- correspondence is not permitted (LCvR 5.1(a)). Please refile. (zjm) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Friday, November 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, October 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , Dkt.4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Patrick F. Lennon is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/17/2024. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , Dkt.5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Elliot T. Williams is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/17/2024. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2025.] | ||
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |