Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:25-cv-00523
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:Bexar, 73rd
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 11:09 AM CDT
Defendant
ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Valdez & Trevino 8023 Vantage Drive Suite 700
San Antonio, TX 78230
Plaintiff
Marisela Gonzalez
Damian S. Sullivent The Law Offices of Frederick W. Nessler & Associates PLLC 1600 West Bay Drive
Largo, FL 33770


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 05/16 3:30 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY .(Cuellar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Service of Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stamped Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Original Petition
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/16 3:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Original Petition by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Cuellar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 15, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/15 2:19 PM
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
2 2 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Wed 05/14 3:21 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Damian Scott Sullivent regarding admission in the Western District Court of Texas. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 05/12 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-20166276), filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Cuellar, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Supplement
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 3:13 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Wed 05/14 3:13 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rqr)
Related: [-]