Eagle Theater Operating, LLC
Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary E Lopinot |
Case #: | 6:25-bk-60076 |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Eagle Theater Operating, LLC
1206 N Cross St
Robinson, IL 62454-1734 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Becker Bldg, Room 1100 401 Main St
Peoria, IL 61602 |
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 12:07 PM CDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order and Deficiency Notice Incomplete Filings due by 5/27/2025. (nm) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order requiring Debtor in Possession to set up separate accounts, file reports, and to file disclosure statement and plan. Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/8/2025. Exclusive Period: 9/8/2025. (nm) |
|
Sunday, May 11, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of Credit Card
Sun 05/11 4:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-60076 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9151204, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Eagle Theater Operating, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/7/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 05/27/2025. Schedule A/B due by 05/27/2025. Schedule D due by 05/27/2025. Schedule E/F due by 05/27/2025. Schedule G due by 05/27/2025. Schedule H due by 05/27/2025. Statement of Affairs due by 05/27/2025. Disclosure of Attorney Compensation due by 05/27/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 05/27/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/27/2025. (Wallace, Steven) |