Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary E Lopinot
Case #: 6:25-bk-60078
Case Filed:May 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Beautiful City, LLC
1206 N Cross St
Robinson, IL 62454-1734
Represented By
Steven M Wallace
Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Becker Bldg, Room 1100 401 Main St
Peoria, IL 61602
Represented By
Mark D Skaggs
Us Trustees Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 12:08 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order and Deficiency Notice Mon 05/12 10:16 AM
Order and Deficiency Notice. Incomplete Filings due by 5/27/2025. (rj)
Related: [-]
3 3 order For Plan and Disc. Stmt Mon 05/12 10:15 AM
Order requiring Debtor in Possession to set up separate accounts, file reports, and to file disclosure statement and plan. Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/8/2025. Exclusive Period: 9/8/2025. (rj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 11, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of Credit Card Sun 05/11 4:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-60078 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9151211, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 05/11 4:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Beautiful City, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/7/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 05/27/2025. Schedule A/B due by 05/27/2025. Schedule D due by 05/27/2025. Schedule E/F due by 05/27/2025. Schedule G due by 05/27/2025. Schedule H due by 05/27/2025. Statement of Affairs due by 05/27/2025. Disclosure of Attorney Compensation due by 05/27/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/27/2025. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]