Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00821
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-25-912328-C
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 11:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By
Jerry S. Busby
Cooper Levenson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
William Randal
Represented By
Joseph F. Schmitt
Lerner & Rowe Injury Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 05/14 12:55 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Joshua L. Benson, Esq, added. Attorney Joseph F. Schmitt, Esq terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 5/14/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 05/13 2:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/13/2025. By Deputy Clerk: MAM. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/28/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion Substitute Attorney/Party Tue 05/13 2:02 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joshua L. Benson in for Attorney Joseph F. Schmitt by Plaintiff William Randal. Responses due by 5/27/2025. (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 05/12 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 05/12 10:44 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-25-912328-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-8047937) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/22/2025. (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 05/13 2:26 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (MAM)
Related: [-]