Arocho v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-03936 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER:The above-referenced social security action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Willis for Report and Recommendation. This Order supersedes all prior scheduling orders in this matter. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling, and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Willis and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-e-willis. In order to promote the efficient adjudication of this matter, Judge Willis expects the parties to adhere to the following schedule and comply with the following procedures. As further stated in this Order, Counsel for the Plaintiff must serve this Order on the Defendant and must file proof of such service with the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 5/16/2025) (ar) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Latstetter Dunn on behalf of Luis A. Arocho..(Dunn, Jennifer) |
|
service
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action
Fri 05/16 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 7/15/2025..(jgo) |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER ADMITTING JENNIFER L. DUNN, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE granting7 Motion for Jennifer L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion atdocket entry 7.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/15/2025) (rro) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER: By Order today, the Court is referring this case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before Magistrate Judge Willis. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this Order, either mail or email to Failla_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order (and also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before Magistrate Judge Willis rather than before the undersigned. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before Magistrate Judge Willis, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date of this Order advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/15/2025) (rro) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/15/2025) (rro) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 8. Motions terminated:8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . filed by Luis A. Arocho. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/15/2025) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heetano Shamsoondar on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Shamsoondar, Heetano) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heetano Shamsoondar on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Shamsoondar, Heetano) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 05/14 10:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 05/14 10:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 05/14 10:01 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Jennifer L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) Modified on 5/13/2025 (gp) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Due
Tue 05/13 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Tanusha Thuraisingam. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. Plaintiff and Defendant party names listed on the IFP Application case caption must match exactly as they appear on the pleading caption. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 5/19/2025..(jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 05/13 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tanusha Thuraisingam to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Defendant party name listed on the PDF case caption must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 05/13 10:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tanusha Thuraisingam. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Frank Bisignano, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - PDF Error
Tue 05/13 3:13 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Tanusha Thuraisingam to RE-FILE Document 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. THE CAPTION OF THE PDF DOES NOT MATCH THE CAPTION OF THE PLEADING. .. (gp) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 05/13 9:04 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Jennifer L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju) |
||
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31066291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) Modified on 5/12/2025 (rju) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Frank Bisignano, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Document filed by Luis A. Arocho..(Thuraisingam, Tanusha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/12 2:14 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 4 MOTION for Jennifer L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31066291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit must be stamped and notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (rju) |