New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-03940
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:270 Miller Act (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Debtor
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

,
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:12 PM EDT
Plaintiff
United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Roebell Painters Co., Inc.
Represented By
Marshall M. Stern
Marshall M. Stern, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/13 12:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Roebell Painters Co., Inc...(Stern, Marshall)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/13 12:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stern, Marshall)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Fee Due Tue 05/13 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Marshall M. Stern. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 5/19/2025..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/13 11:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marshall M. Stern to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/13 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marshall M. Stern to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff/Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Civil Case Opening Fee Payment Tue 05/13 12:51 PM
Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31072568..(Stern, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/12 1:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Roebell Painters Co., Inc...(Stern, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Roebell Painters Co., Inc...(Stern, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet