Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 7:25-cv-00223
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 1:15 PM CDT
Defendant
Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Plaintiff
AML IP, LLC
Represented By
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/14 4:51 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 8:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Mon 05/12 12:18 PM
NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by AML IP, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 05/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/12 12:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 05/12 12:16 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-20164759), filed by AML IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/13 8:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022 . CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb3)
Related: [-]