California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-04083
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 12:11 PM PDT
Defendant
SANTA CRUZ MOUNTAINS WINEGROWERS ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff
David Gordon Oppenheimer
Represented By
Lawrence Griffith Townsend
Law Offices Of Lawrence G. Townsend
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 05/13 11:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Gordon Oppenheimer.. (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Copyright Tue 05/13 11:12 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/13 11:10 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by David Gordon Oppenheimer (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/13 10:14 AM
Proposed Summons. (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/12 4:22 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 05/12 4:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Copyright , within five days of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 05/12 11:57 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/12 11:22 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by David Gordon Oppenheimer . (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/12 11:22 AM
Proposed Summons. (Townsend, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Santa Cruz Mountains Winegrowers Association ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20665560.). Filed by David Gordon Oppenheimer. (Townsend, Lawrence) Modified on 5/12/2025 (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 05/12 4:14 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***For the Proposed Summons, this filing does not comply with FRCvP Rule 4(a)(1) as the summons does not contain the name of the court. This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Office. Please amend and re-file the Proposed Summons in its entirety.*** Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by David Gordon Oppenheimer (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]