Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referred: Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 2:25-cv-00105
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:181st District Court of Randall County, Texas, 86448B
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:14 PM CDT
Defendant
Braum's, Inc.
Represented By
Robin R Gant
Mayer LLP
contact info
Zach T Mayer
Mayer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Milam
Represented By
Neill Nwoha
The Nwoha Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Fri 05/16 5:27 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: **Lead counsel for each party is required to attend in-person.** Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/2/2025. FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2025 10:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/16/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 2:28 PM
STANDING ORDERS: This case is subject to the following standing orders, which concern: (1) compliance with the local counsel requirements of the Northern District of Texas; (2) required procedures for any discovery disputes that may arise in this case; and (3) required procedures for any motions for leave to file documents under seal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/16/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/16 2:17 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri May 16 14:17:58 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/16 5:33 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Fri May 16 17:33:12 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/15 5:02 PM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 5/15/2025) (cmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 qcref Kacsmaryk Tue 05/13 10:10 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid.5 Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nht)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/13 10:12 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. (Copy of NEF Doc 1 also mailed) Tue May 13 10:12:29 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 misc Designation of Lead Counsel Mon 05/12 1:44 PM
Designation of lead counsel Robin R Gant for Defendant Braum's, Inc.. (Gant, Robin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 05/12 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Braum's, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Gant, Robin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 05/12 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Braum's, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15491849) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gant, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 Additional Page(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B