Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-22180
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.,
Plaintiff
SOPHYE FAHRER
Represented By
Tonya Jean Meister
Meister Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/14 11:21 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/14/2025) (fbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 05/13 3:22 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Referring Case to Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.,. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 05/13 9:04 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.,. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18441329, filed by SOPHYE FAHRER.(Meister, Tonya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)