Montana District Court
Judge:John Johnston
Case #: 2:25-cv-00048
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:07 PM MDT
Defendant
Haymaker Apartments
Defendant
Roadhouse Property Management
Plaintiff
Andrew Colby Alexander
3105 West Garfield Street Unit 102
Bozeman, MT 59718


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
5 5 notice Pro Se Notice - MT Wed 05/21 12:10 AM
Pro Se Notice by Andrew Colby Alexander (Alexander, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
4 4 notice Pro Se Notice - MT Tue 05/20 7:58 PM
Pro Se Notice by Andrew Colby Alexander (Alexander, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Pro Se PACER Approval Tue 05/20 10:09 AM
REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Andrew Colby Alexander. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
3 3 notice Pro Se Registration Form Mon 05/19 4:53 PM
PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Andrew Colby Alexander. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 05/14 10:31 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number DMTX9-19513 (TAG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening - MT Mon 05/12 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re1 Complaint (KJC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 05/12 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Haymaker Apartments, Roadhouse Property Management, filed by Andrew Colby Alexander. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Master Exhibit Index Andrew Alexander,
Att: 3 Exhibit F-H Andrew Alexander
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 05/12 12:22 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number Pending (KJC)
Related: [-]