Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:25-cv-00527
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:407th Judicial District Court of Bexar County, 2025CIO7381
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 3:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Neiman Marcus Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Christopher C. Martin


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 9 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 3:45 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formats shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by June 16, 2025. Therefore, within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order, each party shall sign the appropriate election form to be filed with the Clerk's Office (see attached). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bt)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 3:43 PM
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
3 3 misc Supplement to Wed 05/14 3:51 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal, by Neiman Marcus Group, LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 05/12 3:38 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neiman Marcus Group, LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 05/12 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Neiman Marcus Group, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-20166345), filed by Neiman Marcus Group, LLC.(Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Documents Attached List:,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/15 1:29 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vnd)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Thu 05/15 1:30 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (vnd)
Related: [-]