Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 5:25-cv-02403
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:11 PM EDT
Defendant
MICHAEL BERGER
127 Quarry Rd. #1 & #2
KUTZTOWN, PA 19530
Defendant
JUDY DAUB
Defendant
STEVE HARING
127 QUARRY RD #1 & #2
KUTZTOWN, PA 19530
Defendant
MARTIN KOZLOWSKI
Defendant
MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP
127 QUARRY ROAD
KUTZTOWN, PA 19530
Defendant
MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY
127 Quarry Rd. #1 & #2
Kutztown, PA 19530
Defendant
STEVEN MOYER
Defendant
STEPHEN PRICE
Defendant
JOSHUA TUCKER
Defendant
VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC
Defendant
STEVE WEHR
Plaintiff
ADVANTAGE POINT, LP
Represented By
KYLE GARABEDIAN
Kang Haggerty LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 05/20 10:06 AM
ORDER THAT THE3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED. A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, MAY 29, 2025, AT 10:00 A.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS INSTRUCTED TO HAVE ALL COUNSEL AND/OR PARTIES ON THE LINE AND THEN CALL CHAMBERS AT 610-333-1833 TO BE CONNECTED WITH JUDGE HENRY. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO MEET AND CONFER TO DISCUSS THE CASE PRIOR TO THIS STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ADVANTAGE POINT SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS BY MAY 20, 2025, AT 5:00 P.M.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 5/19/25.5/20/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/19 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid L. Khuri on behalf of VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC (Khuri, Brigid)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/19 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN ANTHONY on behalf of VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC (ANTHONY, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/19 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADVANTAGE POINT, LP re: Chad Spotts served Summons and Complaint upon VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC. VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC served on 5/16/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. (GARABEDIAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/19 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADVANTAGE POINT, LP re: Chad Spotts served Summons and Complaint upon MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY. MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY served on 5/16/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. (GARABEDIAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/20 10:08 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/29/2025 10:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY. (mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/15 11:28 AM
ORDER OF 5/15/25 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC 3) FILED BY PLAINTIFF IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON MONDAY, MAY 19, 2025 AT 3:00PM. ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT ADVANTAGE POINT SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS BY MAY 16, 2025 AT 5:00PM. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 5/15/25. 5/15/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 11:20 AM
Summons Issued as to MICHAEL BERGER, JUDY DAUB, STEVE HARING, MARTIN KOZLOWSKI, MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP, MAXATAWNY TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY, STEVEN MOYER, STEPHEN PRICE, JOSHUA TUCKER, VILLAS OF MAXATAWNY, KOBO, I, LLC, STEVE WEHR. Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/13/25 (mas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Lavelle on behalf of ADVANTAGE POINT, LP (Lavelle, Kelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD T. KANG on behalf of ADVANTAGE POINT, LP (KANG, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/12 5:57 PM
NOTICE by ADVANTAGE POINT, LP re1 Complaint (Attorney),, [amended] designation form (GARABEDIAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 05/12 5:23 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ADVANTAGE POINT, LP..(GARABEDIAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Mon 05/12 4:39 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 05/12 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18285572.), filed by ADVANTAGE POINT, LP.(GARABEDIAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Reservation Agreement 3,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Reservation Agreement 4,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - The Amendment,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Termination Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Correspondence from Solicitor Price,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Sewer Calculation,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 2024. 2.22 MTMA Meeting Minutes,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 2024. 7.25 Meeting Minutes
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 05/12 4:45 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The question pertaining to related cases on the DESIGNATION FORM has to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]