Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00542
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Judge Travis Lampley
Defendant
Rutherford County, Tennessee
Plaintiff
Scott Wilson
Represented By
Wesley B. Clark
Brazil Clark, PLLC
contact info
Kyle F. Mothershead
Relentless Advocacy, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 05/16 8:48 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jason N King admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/15 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason N King on behalf of Travis Lampley, Rutherford County, Tennessee (King, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/15 1:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Wilson. Travis Lampley waiver sent on 5/15/2025. (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/15 1:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Wilson. Rutherford County, Tennessee waiver sent on 5/15/2025. (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 7:59 AM
Summons issued as to Travis Lampley, Rutherford County, Tennessee. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 05/13 7:56 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/18/2025 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 05/12 4:54 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 05/12 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Travis Lampley, Rutherford County, Tennessee (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4321439), filed by Scott Wilson.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 05/12 4:56 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead, Wesley B. Clark admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
***DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR.*** Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) Modified on 5/12/2025 (kc).
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Mon 05/12 4:57 PM
***DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR.*** Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) Modified on 5/12/2025 (kc)
Related: [-]