Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:25-cv-00222
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:741 Shipping
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:08 PM CDT
Petitioner
Associated Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Keith Eaves
Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/19 8:43 AM
ORDER granting2 MOTION to Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipulation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims by Associated Marine Services, Inc. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/16/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 10:29 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Deputy U.S. District Clerk 5/16/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 10:26 AM
AMENDED ORDER granting3 Motion to Approve the Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/16/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Deputy U.S. District Clerk 5/14/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Wed 05/14 9:45 AM
ORDER granting4 Petitioner's Motion to Deposit Funds into Registry of the Court as security for cost. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/13/2025. (CC: by email, Finance). (KMH)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 9:37 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Approve the Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/13/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 05/13 8:30 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 motion Deposit Funds Mon 05/12 5:08 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry by Associated Marine Services, Inc..(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/12 5:06 PM
MOTION to Approve the Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and or Limitation of Liability by Associated Marine Services, Inc..(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/12 5:04 PM
MOTION to Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipulation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims by Associated Marine Services, Inc..(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Associated Marine Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10834875.), filed by Associated Marine Services, Inc..(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/13 8:29 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (KMH)
Related: [-]