New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Gary Stein
Case #: 1:25-cv-03913
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 11:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Social Security Administration Office of Regional Chief Counsel,Region II 26 Federal Plaza, Rm 3904
New York, NY 10278
Represented By
Padma Ghatage
Social Security Administration
contact info
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
Woodlawn, MD 21235
Plaintiff
Nissa Saavedra
9 Isabel Lane Apt 115
Monticello, NY 12701
Represented By
Josephine Gottesman
Dennis Kenny Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
service Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action Wed 05/14 8:43 AM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 7/14/2025..(gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Tue 05/13 4:58 PM
ORDER: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 5/13/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/13 4:40 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 5/12/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 05/13 4:38 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to conduct all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 5/12/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 8:58 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Padma Ghatage on behalf of Commissioner of the Social Security Administration..(Ghatage, Padma)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/12 12:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 05/12 12:37 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/12 12:37 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Nissa Saavedra..(Gottesman, Josephine)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottesman, Josephine)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Document filed by Nissa Saavedra..(Gottesman, Josephine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Appeals Council denial