Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00581
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Gregory H. Boyce
Defendant
Natascha Viljoen
Defendant
Susan N. Story
Defendant
Julio M. Quintana
Defendant
Thomas R. Palmer
Defendant
Karyn F. Ovelmen
Defendant
Jane Nelson
Defendant
Rene Medori
Defendant
Jose Manuel Madero
Defendant
Sally-Anne Layman
Defendant
Emma FitzGerald
Defendant
Maura J. Clark
Defendant
Bruce R. Brook
Defendant
Philip Aiken
Nominal Defendant
Newmont Corporation
Plaintiff
George Willis
Represented By
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Sally-Anne Layman served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Philip Aiken served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Emma FitzGerald served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Jose Manuel Madero served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Susan N. Story served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Maura J. Clark served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Rene Medori served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Julio M. Quintana served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Jane Nelson served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Bruce R. Brook served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Gregory H. Boyce served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Natascha Viljoen served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Karyn F. Ovelmen served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Thomas R. Palmer served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 11:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Willis.Newmont Corporation served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 10:58 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 05/12 8:57 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 8:56 AM
VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Philip Aiken, Gregory H. Boyce, Bruce R. Brook, Maura J. Clark, Emma FitzGerald, Sally-Anne Layman, Jose Manuel Madero, Rene Medori, Jane Nelson, Karyn F. Ovelmen, Thomas R. Palmer, Julio M. Quintana, Susan N. Story, Natascha Viljoen (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4683498) - filed by George Willis.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of George Willis,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Mon 05/12 8:57 AM
No Summons Issued. (mpb)
Related: [-]